TX HB4230 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duties of the Texas Veterans Commission regarding citizenship of veterans.
Title
Relating to the duties of the Texas Veterans Commission regarding citizenship of veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4230 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04230I.htm |