TX HB4235 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for burglary of a commercial building in which trade or commerce is conducted.
Title
Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for burglary of a commercial building in which trade or commerce is conducted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2099 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4235 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04235I.htm |