TX HB4244 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to donations to certain local charities ordered to be paid as a condition of community supervision.
Title
Relating to donations to certain local charities ordered to be paid as a condition of community supervision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
GIFTS & DONATIONS
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Military & Veterans
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
GIFTS & DONATIONS
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Military & Veterans