TX HB4279 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Water Development Board to establish, operate, and, through the issuance of general obligation bonds, finance a grant program to provide financial assistance to political subdivisions and the state for projects related to disaster recovery; disaster mitigation; or construct, repair, rehabilitate, or reconstruct state or local infrastructure.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Water Development Board to establish, operate, and, through the issuance of general obligation bonds, finance a grant program to provide financial assistance to political subdivisions and the state for projects related to disaster recovery; disaster mitigation; or construct, repair, rehabilitate, or reconstruct state or local infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR114 (Enabling for) 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
SB2437 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
SB2437 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
BONDS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
DISASTER MITIGATION, RECOVERY, RESPONSE AND INFRASTRUCTURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE, TEXAS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
TREASURY SAFEKEEPING TRUST COMPANY, TEXAS
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
BONDS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
DISASTER MITIGATION, RECOVERY, RESPONSE AND INFRASTRUCTURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE, TEXAS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
TREASURY SAFEKEEPING TRUST COMPANY, TEXAS
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4279 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04279I.htm |