TX HB4303 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of magistrates in Kerr County.
Title
Relating to the creation of magistrates in Kerr County.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4715 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
KERR COUNTY
MAGISTRATES
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
KERR COUNTY
MAGISTRATES
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4303 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04303I.htm |