TX HB4306 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Considered in public hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Considered in public hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to border security infrastructure enhancement projects and the creation of a fund to pay for those projects; allocating the earnings on the balance of that fund and reimbursement of related expenditures; including a study on water retention infrastructure near the border.
Title
Relating to border security infrastructure enhancement projects and the creation of a fund to pay for those projects; allocating the earnings on the balance of that fund and reimbursement of related expenditures; including a study on water retention infrastructure near the border.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Amended RV#882 (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#882 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Biedermann |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 3-Nevárez |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 2-Gutierrez |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Biedermann |
2019-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/1/19 1:30 PM |
2019-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-30 | House | Postponed 5/1/19 6:00 AM |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aliens
BORDER
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Governor
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
BORDER
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Governor
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control