TX HB4308 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Gulf Coast Waste Disposal Authority and expanding the territory and powers of the authority; authorizing fees and the issuance of bonds.
Title
Relating to the Gulf Coast Waste Disposal Authority and expanding the territory and powers of the authority; authorizing fees and the issuance of bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-05-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-07 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Conservation
Environment
Environment--Water
GULF COAST WASTE DISPOSAL AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Energy--Conservation
Environment
Environment--Water
GULF COAST WASTE DISPOSAL AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB4308 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB04308I.htm |