TX HB4308 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to conditions of employment for an employee of certain sheriff's or constable's departments.
Title
Relating to conditions of employment for an employee of certain sheriff's or constable's departments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4308 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04308I.htm |