TX HB4337 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to positions designated as exempt from sheriff's department civil service systems in certain counties.
Title
Relating to positions designated as exempt from sheriff's department civil service systems in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4337 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04337I.htm |