TX HB4347 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to use certain tax revenue for hotel and convention center projects and other qualified projects.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to use certain tax revenue for hotel and convention center projects and other qualified projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1718 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1038 (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1038 (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1718 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Seliger |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1038 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 4-Springer |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-P. King |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment amended 3-Guillen |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment amended 2-P. King |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-P. King |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2210 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB2194 (Similar To) 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2194 (Similar To) 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
BONDS
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONVENTIONS & CONVENTION CENTERS
HOTELS & MOTELS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONVENTIONS & CONVENTION CENTERS
HOTELS & MOTELS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy