TX HB4348 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain minors to consent to Texas Home Visiting Program services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain minors to consent to Texas Home Visiting Program services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-24HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-25HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback