TX HB435 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on December 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to the penalty for theft of a pet.
Title
Relating to the penalty for theft of a pet.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Tara Ybarra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-02-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2008-12-18 | Filed |