TX HB436 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the cessation of tolls by toll project entities in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to the cessation of tolls by toll project entities in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB374 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Highways
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB436 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00436I.htm |