TX HB4372 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to youth camp abuse complaints and compliance orders.
Title
Relating to youth camp abuse complaints and compliance orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1811 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1811 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended FA1 Whitmire |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered FA2 Whitmire |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Whitmire |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1258 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PUBLIC NOTICE
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
YOUTH CAMPS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PUBLIC NOTICE
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
YOUTH CAMPS