TX HB4420 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to insurance coverage for the disposition of embryonic and fetal tissue remains.
Title
Relating to insurance coverage for the disposition of embryonic and fetal tissue remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1258 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |