TX HB444 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing the criminal penalties for insider trading and other misuse of official information by public servants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing the criminal penalties for insider trading and other misuse of official information by public servants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#205 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#205
2019-04-09HousePassed
2019-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-11-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback