TX HB4441 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requests for certain information by the Texas Judicial Council regarding reductions of state jail felony punishment to misdemeanor punishment.
Title
Relating to requests for certain information by the Texas Judicial Council regarding reductions of state jail felony punishment to misdemeanor punishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1311 (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1311 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
TEXAS JUDICIAL COUNCIL
Courts
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
TEXAS JUDICIAL COUNCIL