TX HB4457 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the minimum number of county jailers necessary to staff a county jail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the minimum number of county jailers necessary to staff a county jail.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-10HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-26HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-26HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback