TX HB446 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the criminal consequences of engaging in certain conduct with respect to certain instruments designed, made, or adapted for use in striking a person.
Title
Relating to the criminal consequences of engaging in certain conduct with respect to certain instruments designed, made, or adapted for use in striking a person.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. John Frullo [R] |
Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Amended RV#193 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Amended RV#193 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#193 |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended 1-Tinderholt |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-03 | House | Filed |