TX HB448 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of an offense for failing to secure certain children in a rear-facing child passenger safety seat system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of an offense for failing to secure certain children in a rear-facing child passenger safety seat system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1778 (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#372 (Y: 98 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1778
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#372
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-15HouseAmended 1-Price
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-12-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1524 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB448
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00448I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00448H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00448E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00448S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00448F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB448&RcdVtNo=372&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=165
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=166
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB448&RcdVtNo=1778&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=168

Bill Comments

feedback