TX HB449 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement that a public or private institution of higher education include a notation on a student's transcript under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to a requirement that a public or private institution of higher education include a notation on a student's transcript under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Victoria Neave Criado [D] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Amended RV#499 (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amended RV#428 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Amended RV#499 (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amended RV#428 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#499 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-04-17 | House | Amended 1-Murr |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-17 | House | Postponed 4/17/19 1:00 PM |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-17 | House | Postponed |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#428 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-16 | House | Amended 1-C. Turner |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS