TX HB4493 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to supplemental environmental projects authorized by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to supplemental environmental projects authorized by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1269 (Y: 93 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1269 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2559 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General