TX HB4533 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration and operation of Medicaid, including Medicaid managed care and the delivery of Medicaid acute care services and long-term services and supports to certain persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration and operation of Medicaid, including Medicaid managed care and the delivery of Medicaid acute care services and long-term services and supports to certain persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1804 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1284 (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1804
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateAmended
2019-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Kolkhorst
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateAmended
2019-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1284
2019-05-10HousePassed as amended
2019-05-10HouseAmended 1-Klick
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-26HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4533
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04533I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04533H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04533E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04533S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04533F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4533&RcdVtNo=1284&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=172
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=175
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4533&RcdVtNo=1804&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019

Bill Comments

feedback