TX HB454 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorization for a caregiver who is a relative to enroll a child in school.
Title
Relating to authorization for a caregiver who is a relative to enroll a child in school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Parent & Child
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Parent & Child