TX HB4543 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to implementation of the system redesign for the delivery of Medicaid benefits to persons with intellectual or developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to implementation of the system redesign for the delivery of Medicaid benefits to persons with intellectual or developmental disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1036 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1036
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-26HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback