TX HB4545 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a county, city, or independent school district posting election results on an Internet website.
Title
Relating to a county, city, or independent school district posting election results on an Internet website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1229 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--General
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--General
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4545 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04545I.htm |