TX HB4562 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Jurisprudence

Summary

Relating to medical assistance program reimbursement for guardianship expenses of certain recipients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to medical assistance program reimbursement for guardianship expenses of certain recipients.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-19 Referred to Jurisprudence
2009-05-19 Read first time
2009-05-18 Received from the House
2009-05-17 Reported engrossed
2009-05-15 Record vote
2009-05-15 Passed
2009-05-15 Read 3rd time
2009-05-15 Passed to engrossment
2009-05-15 Read 2nd time
2009-05-15 Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2009-05-13 Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
2009-05-06 Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2009-05-06 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-05-05 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-28 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-04-28 Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2009-04-28 Considered in formal meeting
2009-04-23 Left pending in committee
2009-04-23 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-04-23 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-23 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-26 Referred to Human Services
2009-03-26 Read first time
2009-03-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

SB2435 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback