TX HB4570 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing an advisory board to study surface water and groundwater interaction.
Title
Relating to establishing an advisory board to study surface water and groundwater interaction.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
SURFACE WATER & GROUNDWATER INTERACTION ADVISORY BOARD
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Environment--Water
SURFACE WATER & GROUNDWATER INTERACTION ADVISORY BOARD
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4570 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04570I.htm |