TX HB4611 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain distributions to the available school fund.
Title
Relating to certain distributions to the available school fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#681 (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#681 (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | See remarks for effective date | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#681 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended 1-Huberty |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-24 | House | Postponed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-03 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR151 (Enabling for) 2019-05-22 - Filed with the Secretary of State