TX HB4634 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority; following the recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Title
Relating to the Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority; following the recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-14 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB626 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Governor
GUADALUPE-BLANCO RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset—Required Reviews
GUADALUPE-BLANCO RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset—Required Reviews
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4634 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04634I.htm |