TX HB464 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain procedures for and relief that may be granted pursuant to an application for a writ of habeas corpus.
Title
Relating to certain procedures for and relief that may be granted pursuant to an application for a writ of habeas corpus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1334 (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1334 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-09 | House | Amended 1-J. González |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-05 | House | Filed |