TX HB4716 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on March 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 525; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 525; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-15 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-14 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-30 | Read first time | |
2009-03-24 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1464 (Same As) 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Subjects
HARRIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 525
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility