TX HB4717 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of additional county courts at law in Hidalgo County.
Title
Relating to the creation of additional county courts at law in Hidalgo County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1843 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4717 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04717I.htm |