TX HB4732 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to boundaries of the Anthem Municipal Utility District.
Title
Relating to boundaries of the Anthem Municipal Utility District.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-04-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4647 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
SB2548 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
SB2548 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Subjects
ANTHEM MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4732 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04732I.htm |