TX HB4746 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the board of directors of the Boling Municipal Water District.
Title
Relating to the board of directors of the Boling Municipal Water District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4747 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BOLING MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4746 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04746I.htm |