TX HB4749 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Rose City Municipal Utility District; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and fees.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Rose City Municipal Utility District; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1934 (Y: 75 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1934 (Y: 75 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | See remarks for effective date | |
2019-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1934 |
2019-05-25 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-24 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn Article III, Section 56 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to refuse to concur in Senate amdts. |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1258 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ROSE CITY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility