TX HB475 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the adjutant general to operate post exchanges on state military property.
Title
Relating to authorizing the adjutant general to operate post exchanges on state military property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-17 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-03-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-10 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2010-12-29 | Filed |