TX HB488 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for a juvenile's appearance in a judicial proceeding.
Title
Relating to requirements for a juvenile's appearance in a judicial proceeding.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D] |
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Minors--Juvenile Justice
RESTRAINTS
Courts--General
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Minors--Juvenile Justice
RESTRAINTS