TX HB50 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of migrant labor housing facilities.
Title
Relating to the regulation of migrant labor housing facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB697 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Agriculture
Aliens
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
Labor
Labor--Agricultural Workers
Aliens
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
Labor
Labor--Agricultural Workers
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB50 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00050I.htm |