TX HB504 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to employment protections for a person serving as a grand juror.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to employment protections for a person serving as a grand juror.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenatePassed
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-30SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-30SenateRead first time
2019-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-26HouseRecord vote RV#752
2019-04-26HousePassed
2019-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-26HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-12-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback