TX HB540 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of U.S. Highway 75 in Richardson as the Officer David Sherrard Memorial Highway.
Title
Relating to the designation of U.S. Highway 75 in Richardson as the Officer David Sherrard Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] |
Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#69 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#69 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-04-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-21 | House | Record vote RV#69 |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-03-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB690 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
Highways
OFFICER DAVID SHERRARD MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
RICHARDSON, CITY OF
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
OFFICER DAVID SHERRARD MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
RICHARDSON, CITY OF
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF