TX HB561 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the authority of political subdivisions to adopt or enforce juvenile curfews.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the authority of political subdivisions to adopt or enforce juvenile curfews.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1486 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
CURFEWS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Political Subdivisions
TRUANCY
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
CURFEWS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Political Subdivisions
TRUANCY