TX HB562 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to warning labels for opioid prescription drugs.
Title
Relating to warning labels for opioid prescription drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholism & Drug Abuse
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF