TX HB566 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain criminal defendants for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain criminal defendants for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#592 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#592 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION