TX HB573 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the restoration of certain rights to a criminal defendant.
Title
Relating to the restoration of certain rights to a criminal defendant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB573 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00573I.htm |