TX HB6 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the foundation curriculum, the establishment of the instructional materials allotment, and the adoption, review, and purchase of instructional materials and technological equipment for public schools.
Title
Relating to the foundation curriculum, the establishment of the instructional materials allotment, and the adoption, review, and purchase of instructional materials and technological equipment for public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees w/inst-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-27 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Education | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-06 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Textbooks
Education--School Districts
ELECTRONIC TEXTBOOKS
GIFTS & DONATIONS
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Textbooks
Education--School Districts
ELECTRONIC TEXTBOOKS
GIFTS & DONATIONS
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND