TX HB6 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts, the dedication and rededication of revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.
Title
Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts, the dedication and rededication of revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Otto [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Byron Cook [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Rep. James White [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - HB 6Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | House | House requests conference committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-27 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control