TX HB6 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of services provided by the Department of Family and Protective Services, including foster care, child protective services, and prevention and early intervention services.
Title
Relating to the administration of services provided by the Department of Family and Protective Services, including foster care, child protective services, and prevention and early intervention services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#838 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-10 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-05 | House | Calendars Committee rule adopted |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on Emergency Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2017-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to subcommittee |
2017-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADOPTION
CHILD ABUSE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
FOSTER CARE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
CHILD ABUSE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
FOSTER CARE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION