TX HB601 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criminal or juvenile procedures and reporting requirements regarding persons who are or may be persons with a mental illness or an intellectual disability.
Title
Relating to criminal or juvenile procedures and reporting requirements regarding persons who are or may be persons with a mental illness or an intellectual disability.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1741 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#250 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#250 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1741 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Zaffirini |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#250 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended 2-Price |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended 1-Price |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB432 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
CORRECTIONAL OFFICE ON OFFENDERS WITH MEDICAL OR MENTAL IMPAIRMENTS, TEXAS
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Disabilities, Persons with
MAGISTRATES
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
TEXAS JUDICIAL COUNCIL
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Disabilities, Persons with
MAGISTRATES
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
TEXAS JUDICIAL COUNCIL