TX HB605 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of a healthy and safe school water plan by public schools.
Title
Relating to the adoption of a healthy and safe school water plan by public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2053 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--School Districts
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LEAD POISONING
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--School Districts
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LEAD POISONING
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety